Senate | 05/23/2013 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1341.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | Read first time. To print. |