|
09/26/2014
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6525.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4838.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5301.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|