Senate | 06/19/2014 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/16/2014 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3929.). | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4973.) | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |