Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and AGRI. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |