|
09/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6114.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 16 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4499.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5221.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5088.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|