|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 615, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6550.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6568.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4856.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 4469.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|