California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill May 23, 2014
Bill May 5, 2014
Bill March 28, 2014