Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 4. Page 5017.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|