California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill August 20, 2014
Bill April 24, 2014
Bill March 19, 2014