California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 20, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2014

Amended

Bill June 17, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014