07/09/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 111, Statutes of 2014. | |||
07/09/2014 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/02/2014 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4146.). | ||
Senate | 06/18/2014 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2014 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Senate | 05/22/2014 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4945.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2014 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |