|
09/19/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 475, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 21. Page 6278.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 6. Page 4609.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 5101.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|