|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 405, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 2903.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 6 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2099.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 1515.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/08/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/07/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|