Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |