|
09/29/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 770, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 6389.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4701.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 5228.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|