|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 617, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6665.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4900.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2014
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5303.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|