California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2675 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/26/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2675CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 617 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 26, 2014 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 27, 2014 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lowenthal FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to amend Sections 12203 and 12211 of the Public Contract Code, relating to state contracts. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2675, Lowenthal. State agency: public contracts. Existing law requires each state agency to ensure that at least 50% of reportable purchases, which are goods and materials that may be reported or categorized within a specified product category, are recycled products. This bill would require each state agency to ensure that at least 75% of reportable purchases are recycled products on and after January 1, 2020, except for paint, antifreeze, and tires, which would remain at the 50% requirement. Existing law requires a state agency, except the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection, to annually report its progress in meeting recycled product purchasing requirements, as specified. This bill would remove the exception pertaining to the Department of Forestry and Fire Protection. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12203 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 12203. Each state agency shall ensure each of the following: (a) (1) Before January 1, 2020, at least 50 percent of reportable purchases are recycled products. (2) On and after January 1, 2020, at least 75 percent of reportable purchases are recycled products, except for paint, antifreeze, and tires. (3) On and after January 1, 2020, at least 50 percent of reportable purchases of paint, antifreeze, and tires are recycled products. (b) The requirements specified in this article apply to all reportable purchases of state agencies for product categories listed in this article. (c) The reportable purchases of state agencies shall meet each requirement for, and be applied to the total dollar amount of, each specified product category as defined in this article. The purchase of a recycled product from one category may not be applied toward the requirements for, or the total dollar amount of, any other category listed in this article. (d) Each state agency shall require the businesses with whom it contracts to use, to the maximum extent economically feasible in the performance of the contract work, recycled products. SEC. 2. Section 12211 of the Public Contract Code is amended to read: 12211. (a) A state agency shall report annually to the board its progress in meeting the recycled product purchasing requirements using the SABRC report format provided by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery. (b) On or before October 31 of each year, the department shall provide to the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery the following information: (1) A list, by category, of individual reportable recycled products, materials, goods, and supplies that were available for purchase by state agencies from a statewide-use contract, agreement, or schedule during the previous fiscal year. (2) A list, by category, of all reportable products, materials, goods, and supplies that were available for purchase by state agencies from a statewide-use contract, agreement, or schedule, including contract, agreement, or schedule tracking numbers, during the previous fiscal year.