|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 273, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4368.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4838.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|