Senate | 08/14/2014 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2014 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2014 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5358.). | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |