LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2706
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2706
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2706
Compare Versions
AB2706 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB2706 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2706 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2706 Amended May 27, 2014
AB2706 Amended May 1, 2014
AB2706 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2706 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2706 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2706 Chaptered September 29, 2014
AB2706 Enrolled August 29, 2014
AB2706 Amended July 2, 2014
AB2706 Amended May 27, 2014
AB2706 Amended May 1, 2014
AB2706 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2706 Amended March 28, 2014
AB2706 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare