LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2707
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2707
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2707
Compare Versions
AB2707 Chaptered September 9, 2014
AB2707 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB2707 Amended May 22, 2014
AB2707 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2707 Amended April 3, 2014
AB2707 Amended March 11, 2014
AB2707 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2707 Chaptered September 9, 2014
AB2707 Enrolled August 21, 2014
AB2707 Amended May 22, 2014
AB2707 Amended April 21, 2014
AB2707 Amended April 3, 2014
AB2707 Amended March 11, 2014
AB2707 Introduced February 21, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare