Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5197.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2014
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|