Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |