Senate | 06/15/2014 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). | ||
Senate | 05/28/2014 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2014 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5019.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2014 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |