California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2718 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/28/2014

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2718AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2014 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bloom FEBRUARY 21, 2014 An act to  amend Section 25302 of   add Section 3160.5 to  the Public Resources Code, relating to  energy.   oil and gas.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2718, as amended, Bloom.  Energy: planning and forecasting.   Oil and gas: well stimulation treatment: notification.   Existing law states the policy of the state that a copy of an approved well stimulation treatment permit and information on the available water sampling and testing be provided to specified tenants of the surface property and surface property owners. Existing law requires the well owners or operators to identify the areas requiring notification and to contract with an independent entity or person who is responsible for, and shall perform, the notification. Existing law requires the independent entity to provide to the Division of Oil, Gas, and Geothermal Resources a list of specified information regarding the notification.   This bill would require the division to develop a form to be used when providing the notification. The bill would require the independent entity or person to provide to the division a copy of the notification. Because a failure of the independent entity or person to provide to the division a copy of the notification would be a crime, this bill would impose a state-mandated local program.   The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement.   This bill would provide that no reimbursement is required by this act for a specified reason.   Existing law requires the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission to prepare an integrated energy policy report every 2 years.   This bill would make nonsubstantive changes to that provision.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program:  no   yes  . THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 3160.5 is added to the   Public Resources Code   , to read:   3160.5. (a) The division shall develop a form that the independent entity or person shall use when providing the notification required pursuant to subparagraph (A) of paragraph (6) of subdivision (d) of Section 3160. The form shall be prepared in English and Spanish and designed to be easily understood by a layperson not trained in oil and gas development. (b) The independent entity or person shall provide to the division a copy of the notification provided to a tenant of a surface property and surface property owner or authorized agent of the owner pursuant to subparagraph (A) of paragraph (6) of subdivision (d) of Section 3160.   SEC. 2.   No reimbursement is required by this act pursuant to Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution because the only costs that may be incurred by a local agency or school district will be incurred because this act creates a new crime or infraction, eliminates a crime or infraction, or changes the penalty for a crime or infraction, within the meaning of Section 17556 of the Government Code, or changes the definition of a crime within the meaning of Section 6 of Article XIII B of the California Constitution.   SECTION 1.   Section 25302 of the Public Resources Code is amended to read: 25302. (a) Beginning November 1, 2003, and every two years thereafter, the commission shall adopt an integrated energy policy report. This integrated report shall contain an overview of major energy trends and issues facing the state, including, but not limited to, supply, demand, pricing, reliability, efficiency, and impacts on public health and safety, the economy, resources, and the environment. Energy markets and systems shall be grouped and assessed in three subsidiary volumes: (1) Electricity and natural gas markets. (2) Transportation fuels, technologies, and infrastructure. (3) Public interest energy strategies. (b) The commission shall compile the integrated energy policy report prepared pursuant to subdivision (a) by consolidating the analyses and findings of the subsidiary volumes in paragraphs (1), (2), and (3) of subdivision (a). The integrated energy policy report shall present policy recommendations based on an indepth and integrated analysis of the most current and pressing energy issues facing the state. The analyses supporting the integrated energy policy report shall explicitly address interfuel and intermarket effects to provide a more informed evaluation of potential tradeoffs when developing energy policy across different markets and systems. (c) The integrated energy policy report shall include an assessment and forecast of system reliability and the need for resource additions, efficiency, and conservation that considers all aspects of energy industries and markets that are essential for the state economy, general welfare, public health and safety, energy diversity, and protection of the environment. This assessment shall be based on determinations made pursuant to this chapter. (d) Beginning November 1, 2004, and every two years thereafter, the commission shall prepare an energy policy review to update analyses from the integrated energy policy report prepared pursuant to subdivisions (a), (b), and (c), or to raise energy issues that have emerged since the release of the integrated energy policy report. The commission may also periodically prepare and release technical analyses and assessments of energy issues and concerns to provide timely and relevant information for the Governor, the Legislature, market participants, and the public. (e) In preparation of the integrated energy policy report, the commission shall consult with the following entities: the Public Utilities Commission, the Office of Ratepayer Advocates, the State Air Resources Board, the Electricity Oversight Board, the Independent System Operator, the Department of Water Resources, the California Consumer Power and Conservation Financing Authority, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of Motor Vehicles, and any federal, state, and local agencies it deems necessary in preparation of the report. To ensure collaborative development of state energy policies, these agencies shall make a good faith effort to provide data, assessment, and proposed recommendations for review by the commission. (f) The commission shall provide the report to the Public Utilities Commission, the Office of Ratepayer Advocates, the State Air Resources Board, the Electricity Oversight Board, the Independent System Operator, the Department of Water Resources, the California Consumer Power and Conservation Financing Authority, and the Department of Transportation. For the purpose of ensuring consistency in the underlying information that forms the foundation of energy policies and decisions affecting the state, those entities shall carry out their energy-related duties and responsibilities based upon the information and analyses contained in the report. If an entity listed in this subdivision objects to information contained in the report, and has a reasonable basis for that objection, the entity shall not be required to consider that information in carrying out its energy-related duties. (g) The commission shall make the report accessible to state, local, and federal entities and to the general public.