California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill August 20, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill April 19, 2013
Bill April 18, 2013