Assembly | 05/23/2014 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2014 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2014 | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2014 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2014 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2014 | Introduced. To print. |