Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2013 | Read first time. To print. |