Senate
|
08/26/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2014
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5022.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|