Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5195.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|