|
08/25/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5958.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2474.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4839.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4633.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2014
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2014
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|