LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2762
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2762
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2762
Compare Versions
AB2762 Chaptered July 9, 2014
AB2762 Enrolled June 30, 2014
AB2762 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2762 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2762 Introduced March 24, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB2762 Chaptered July 9, 2014
AB2762 Enrolled June 30, 2014
AB2762 Amended May 6, 2014
AB2762 Amended April 24, 2014
AB2762 Introduced March 24, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare