Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/11/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|