Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2013 | Read first time. To print. |