Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 1145.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|