|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 3286.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2347.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 1. Page 1921.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1896.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Measure version as amended on April 16 corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|