Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|