LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB307
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB307
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB307
Compare Versions
AB307 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB307 Enrolled August 30, 2013
AB307 Amended August 14, 2013
AB307 Amended April 4, 2013
AB307 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB307 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB307 Enrolled August 30, 2013
AB307 Amended August 14, 2013
AB307 Amended April 4, 2013
AB307 Introduced February 12, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare