Senate | 08/30/2013 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1788.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and V.A. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2013 | Read first time. To print. |