California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB324 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill August 14, 2013
Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013