Senate
|
08/29/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 29). Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 4982.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Correa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 1040.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|