|
03/06/2014
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
01/06/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2247.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 1564.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|