|
10/05/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2769.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1976.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1667.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|