|
10/02/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 485, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3204.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2307.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1121.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|