Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2013 | Read first time. To print. |