Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1807.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/14/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|