Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2013 | Read first time. To print. |