Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cannella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1659.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/03/2012
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|