LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB395
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB395
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB395
Compare Versions
AB395 Amended July 10, 2013
AB395 Amended June 24, 2013
AB395 Amended May 24, 2013
AB395 Amended April 18, 2013
AB395 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB395 Amended July 10, 2013
AB395 Amended June 24, 2013
AB395 Amended May 24, 2013
AB395 Amended April 18, 2013
AB395 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare