California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill June 14, 2013